+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-129
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 309
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 150
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 121
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: ED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor