+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 125
- House Calendar Number 107
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor