+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 305
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 75
- House Calendar Number 89
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor