+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 563
- House Calendar Number 375
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
+ − Vote
April 5, 2018: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 51
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor