+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-142
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 455
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 377
- File Number 585
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 406 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 85
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (21)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor