+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-188
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5465
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5466
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 522
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 153
- File Number 246
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
May 6, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 329 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 36
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 169
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (11)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor