+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-33
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 337
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 97
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 100
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 01/30
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 323 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 23
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (14)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor