+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-223
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 580
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5234
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 376
- File Number 584
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 438 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 254 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (6)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor