+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 254
- File Number 440
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (5)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor