+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 545
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 41
- File Number 44
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 209
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (9)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor