+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor