+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 566
- House Calendar Number 356
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor