+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Act 18-15
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 667
- Senate Calendar Number 477
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3798
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 414
- House Calendar Number 263
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/16
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
March 23, 2018: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor