+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-130
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 730
- Senate Calendar Number 533
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4390
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 670
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 343
- House Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 426 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 30, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 179 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 7