+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-93
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 820
- Senate Calendar Number 622
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7060
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Transportation
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 352
- House Calendar Number 231
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 423 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 189 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsors (30)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor