+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 112
- House Calendar Number 115
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor