+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On April 22, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 468
- House Calendar Number 331
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor