+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 355
- House Calendar Number 229
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 3
March 23, 2018: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor