+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act 22-113
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Calendar Number 560
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4911
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 77
- House Calendar Number 99
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor