+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act 16-47
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 440
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 40
- House Calendar Number 65
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 313
- Yeas: 36
April 19, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 52
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 9