+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: AGE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor