+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 523
- File Number 718
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4150
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 202
- File Number 340
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 164 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (20)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor