+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Combined into HB05163
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor