+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-95
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 567
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5237
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 138
- House Calendar Number 87
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 359 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 3, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 235 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (23)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor