+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 83
- House Calendar Number 61
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Sponsors (4)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor