+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 564
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6415
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 197
- House Calendar Number 178
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor