+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 310
- House Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
March 19, 2018: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor