+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-10
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 651
- Senate Calendar Number 438
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4243
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4279
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 146
- House Calendar Number 117
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2018: INS Vote Tally Sheet-A
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 11
March 15, 2018: INS Vote Tally Sheet-B
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2018: INS Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor