+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 376
- House Calendar Number 289
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
- Public Hearing 02/11
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor