+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 14
- House Calendar Number 43
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/15 5:00 PM
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/10
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor