+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 101
- House Calendar Number 104
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor