+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor