+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act 16-45
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 768
- Senate Calendar Number 552
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5560
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 733
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 5:00 PM
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 483
- House Calendar Number 304
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 327
- Yeas: 36
April 29, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 187 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8