+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-95
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 664
- Senate Calendar Number 473
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3777
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 35
- House Calendar Number 54
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 9, 2018: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 16
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor