+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 439
- House Calendar Number 253
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce