+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 34
- File Number 19
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor