+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 239
- File Number 386
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor