+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 643
- Senate Calendar Number 380
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3788
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 22
- House Calendar Number 54
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/16 5:00 PM
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 12, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 23 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 5