+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-72
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 554
- File Number 739
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3133
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 40
- File Number 43
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 356 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 207 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (23)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor