+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-124
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 461
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 333
- File Number 526
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 410 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 98
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (14)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor