+ − Summary
+ − Actions (5)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation