+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act 16-121
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Calendar Number 597
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5905
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 103
- House Calendar Number 97
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 384
- Yeas: 36
May 4, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR 3
- Yeas: 36