+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-101
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 445
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 34
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 2
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/18 5:00 PM
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 51
February 28, 2018: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor