+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 234
- File Number 400
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor