+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-22
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 699
- Senate Calendar Number 507
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6308
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 408
- File Number 618
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 258 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 80 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (31)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor