+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-136
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 341
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 197
- File Number 335
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 393 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 10, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 40
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor