+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 524
- House Calendar Number 334
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor