+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 329
- House Calendar Number 245
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor