+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference to Human Services
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor