+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-148
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 915
- Senate Calendar Number 627
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8638
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 646
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 405
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 435 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 30, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 281 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor